Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
July 12 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1295.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1157.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0. Page 869.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 571.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|