|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 496, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5593.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6500.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6373.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2024
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2024
|
June 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2024
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3829.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 3723.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|