California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1528 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 19, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill June 24, 2024
Bill April 18, 2024