Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
September 1 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
July 12 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 1357.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1157.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 575.) (March 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|