Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 1269.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1161.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 655.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 452.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Set for hearing March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|