|
10/11/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 774, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 2670.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 17. Page 3144.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
June 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 1206.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 795.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|