|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 596, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2671.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3149.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 2. Page 1358.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1161.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 710.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 450.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|