|
09/22/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 212, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2865.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1342.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 872.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|