Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2024
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Maienschein.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2024
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2992.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2958.) (January 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2957.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Set for hearing January 9 in E. & C.A. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Set for hearing January 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on PUB S. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
April 18 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 0. Page 791.) Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|