Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
June 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 1291.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1162.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 798.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 711.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|