|
10/04/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 305, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2477.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2831.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2023
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bryan.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2023
|
June 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 961.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 657.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|