|
09/01/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2141.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2541.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 700.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 339.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Set for hearing March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|