Senate
|
09/28/2024
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2024
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 5633.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5621.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Set for hearing August 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5416.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6542.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2023
|
July 10 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2023
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2023
|
June 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 1216.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 1011.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
April 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 830.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
March 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|