Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
September 1 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2023
|
June 13 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2023
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 1249.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1158.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 794.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 450.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|