Assembly | 09/01/2023 | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2023 | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2023 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2023 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 12). | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2023 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1297.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1163.) (May 18). | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | April 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Set for hearing April 10. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 450.) (March 22). | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Set for hearing March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |