Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | April 11 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 2. Page 659.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Set for hearing April 11. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB S. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB S. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |