|
09/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 177, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2801.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1207.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 790.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
March 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|