Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
June 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 3049.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3011.) (January 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Set for hearing January 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Set for hearing January 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 2970.) (January 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Senate rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|