|
10/10/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 707, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2738.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3260.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1297.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1165.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
April 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 473.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|