Assembly | 09/01/2023 | September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2023 | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 07/12/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2023 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1297.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1165.) (May 18). | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Set for hearing May 1. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 748.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Com. on HUMANS S. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |