|
06/29/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2220.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 959.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 795.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|