|
10/07/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 376, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2840.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3350.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1050.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
April 24 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 685.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 569.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|