Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 1218.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1166.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 876.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 570.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMANS S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|