Assembly | 06/27/2023 | June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2023 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2023 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1298.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1166.) (May 18). | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 901.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 575.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Set for hearing March 29. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB S. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |