Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1278.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1167.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 686.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 473.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|