California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB372 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill June 28, 2023
Bill June 12, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023