|
09/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 178, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 15. Page 2798.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 1023.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 799.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 3. Page 636.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E. D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|