|
09/22/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 214, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2865.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1299.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1168.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 873.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 683.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|