Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2023
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2739.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3261.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 3010.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1299.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1168.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 832.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|