|
09/19/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 285, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5746.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 5622.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Set for hearing August 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5416.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6504.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2023
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 1077.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1011.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
April 18 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 353.) (March 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Set for hearing March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|