Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Set for hearing May 1. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 799.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and HOUSING. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |