LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB396
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB396
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB396
Action History
Senate
02/01/2024
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Senate
04/13/2023
April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Senate
04/10/2023
Set for hearing April 19.
Senate
02/22/2023
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Senate
02/10/2023
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
Senate
02/09/2023
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.