|
10/11/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 771, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 2596.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 3008.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2023
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 1356.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1156.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 937.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 452.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Set for hearing March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|