California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB401 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2023

Amended

Bill September 8, 2023
Bill September 1, 2023
Bill July 12, 2023
Bill June 19, 2023