|
03/23/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 690.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 264.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 190.) (February 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Set for hearing February 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 171.) (February 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Set for hearing February 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2022
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|