|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 605, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 2418.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2797.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 1077.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 1011.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 795.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|