California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB42 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill August 19, 2024
Bill July 3, 2024
Bill June 25, 2024
Bill June 11, 2024
Bill June 15, 2023