|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 607, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2240.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2793.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2739.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2023
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 700.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 575.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|