Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Niello.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1409.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Motion to reconsider made by Senator Niello.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 8. Page 1408.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 935.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|