Assembly
|
06/26/2023
|
June 26 set for first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1075.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 794.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 546.) (March 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|