Senate | 11/29/2023 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | April 25 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 0. Page 900.) | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | March 28 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 0. Page 577.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Set for hearing March 28. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 12/06/2022 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. | ||
Senate | 12/05/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |