|
09/19/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 286, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5634.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 8. Page 6706.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Wicks.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bryan.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
July 12 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 1261.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1171.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 938.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 797.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Set for hearing April 26 in GOV. & F. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|