Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |