|
10/13/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 874, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2600.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2990.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Blanca Rubio.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2023
|
June 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1103.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 893.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|