|
10/07/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 398, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2470.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2957.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2023
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2742.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1222.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 712.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|