|
07/21/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 110, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
07/21/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2541.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 814.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 686.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 426.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|