California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB464 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill June 29, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023