California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB465 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2023

Amended

Bill June 8, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023