Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Set for hearing May 1. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 710.) (April 12). | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 451.) (March 22). | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | March 29 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Set for hearing March 29 in HEALTH pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Set for hearing March 22. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |