Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 689.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Set for hearing April 11. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |